Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 04/10/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 05/23/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 06/05/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/05/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 06/06/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 06/06/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 06/06/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 06/12/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 07/18/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 03/05/2014