Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 05/20/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 05/20/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 05/20/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/21/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/05/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 06/26/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/08/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 07/24/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/19/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 10/01/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 10/02/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 11/12/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 11/14/2013