Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/15/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/17/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/22/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 06/04/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/05/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/11/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/13/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 07/11/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/16/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 07/17/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/18/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 07/22/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/23/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/31/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 07/31/2013
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 08/01/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/18/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/19/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 09/19/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 10/28/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 11/12/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/19/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 12/11/2013