Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/28/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 06/28/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 07/08/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 07/11/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 07/16/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 07/30/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 07/30/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 07/30/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 08/02/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 10/16/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 01/08/2014