There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Israel QME Enhancement Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Israel QME Enhancement Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the requirements relating to assessment of Israel's qualitative military edge over military threats, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
12/11/2013Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 399 - 0 (Roll no. 636).(text: CR H7650)
05/15/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber
12/12/2013SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
12/11/2013-4:30pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 399 - 0 (Roll no. 636). (text: CR H7650)
12/11/2013-4:24pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7668-7669)
12/11/2013-1:43pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
12/11/2013-1:20pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1992.
12/11/2013-1:20pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7650-7653)
12/11/2013-1:20pmHouseMr. Royce moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
11/20/2013HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
11/20/2013HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
05/16/2013HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H2706-2707)
05/15/2013HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
05/15/2013HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs05/15/2013 Referred to
11/20/2013 Markup by
Senate Foreign Relations12/12/2013 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1992.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1992. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (12/11/2013)

Israel QME Enhancement Act - Directs the President, on a biennial basis, to: (1) carry out an assessment of the extent to which Israel possesses a qualitative military edge over military threats to it, and (2) submit a related report to Congress. (Current law requires an assessment on an ongoing basis and a report every four years.)

Directs the Secretary of State to report to Congress on: (1) the range of cyber and asymmetric threats posed to Israel by state and non-state actors, and (2) joint U.S.-Israel efforts to address such threats.