Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/10/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 10/09/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 10/09/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 10/09/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 10/09/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 10/14/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 10/28/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 10/30/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 10/30/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 11/18/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 11/19/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 12/04/2013