Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 05/16/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 05/16/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 05/16/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 05/17/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 05/17/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 05/17/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/17/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 05/21/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 05/21/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/22/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 05/22/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/26/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 07/09/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/10/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 10/09/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 10/09/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 10/09/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 10/09/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 10/09/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 10/09/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 10/14/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 10/28/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 10/29/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 10/30/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 10/30/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 11/12/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 11/18/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 11/19/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 11/19/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 12/04/2013