Refine your search

Refined by:

Florida Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 06/03/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/03/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 06/06/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 07/10/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 04/04/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 05/07/2014