Refine your search

Refined by:

Massachusetts Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 05/22/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/22/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 06/03/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5] 06/06/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 06/25/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 06/25/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/27/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 07/16/2013
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 02/25/2014