Refine your search

Refined by:

New Jersey Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 06/25/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/27/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/10/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 07/10/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/10/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/18/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/29/2014
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 05/30/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 09/15/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 09/18/2014