Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 06/03/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 06/03/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 06/10/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 06/27/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 07/10/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 08/02/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 09/12/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 10/28/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 10/29/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/30/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 02/04/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/25/2014
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 04/02/2014
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 11/12/2014