Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/03/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 08/01/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/09/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 04/28/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/12/2014