Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-45] 05/22/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/10/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/18/2013
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/24/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 04/28/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 05/07/2014
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 05/30/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/05/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/31/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 09/15/2014
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/15/2014