Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 01/15/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 01/15/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/15/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 01/15/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 01/15/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5] 01/15/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/15/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 01/15/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 01/15/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 01/15/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 01/18/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 01/23/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/04/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/04/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 02/04/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 02/25/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 02/25/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/25/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 03/12/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 03/12/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 04/15/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/12/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 12/12/2013