There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Puerto Rico Status Resolution Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To set forth the process for Puerto Rico to be admitted as a State of the Union.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/15/2013 Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
05/15/2013 Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/15/2013 Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H2611-2612)
Action By: House of Representatives
05/15/2013 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (131)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 05/15/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 05/17/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 05/17/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 05/17/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 05/17/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/20/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/22/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 05/22/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 05/22/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/22/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/22/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 05/22/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 05/23/2013
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 05/23/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 05/23/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/23/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 05/23/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/03/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/03/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 06/03/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/03/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 06/05/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 06/05/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 06/05/2013
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 06/05/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 06/05/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/05/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/05/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/05/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/05/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 06/06/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/11/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/11/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/11/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 06/11/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/12/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/12/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/12/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/12/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/14/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/19/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/19/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/19/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/19/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/19/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/19/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 06/19/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 06/19/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 06/19/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/19/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/27/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 06/27/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 06/27/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/28/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 07/09/2013
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 07/09/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 07/09/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 07/16/2013
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/18/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 07/18/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 07/18/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 07/18/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 07/18/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 07/19/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/22/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 07/22/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 07/23/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/24/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/24/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 07/25/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 07/30/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/30/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/31/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 08/01/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 08/01/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 08/01/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 08/01/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 08/01/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 08/01/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 08/01/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 08/01/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 08/01/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 08/01/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 08/02/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 08/02/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 08/02/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 09/11/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 09/11/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 09/11/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 09/11/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/19/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 10/11/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 12/04/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 12/11/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 12/11/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 12/11/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 02/14/2014
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/21/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources05/15/2013 Referred to

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (7)

  • Caribbean area
  • Congressional districts and representation
  • Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
  • Puerto Rico
  • State and local government operations
  • U.S. territories and protectorates

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2000. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/15/2013)

Puerto Rico Status Resolution Act - Authorizes the State Elections Commission of Puerto Rico to provide for a ratification vote on the admission of Puerto Rico as a state of the United States on an equal footing with the several states in all respects. Requires (if a majority of votes cast in the ratification vote are for the admission of Puerto Rico as a state): (1) the President to submit to Congress legislation to admit Puerto Rico as a state, and (2) Congress to act, through legislation, to admit Puerto Rico as a state.