Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 05/15/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 05/17/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 05/17/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 06/05/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 06/27/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 06/27/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 07/18/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 07/23/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/24/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 08/01/2013