Refine your search

Refined by:

Pennsylvania Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/11/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/19/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 07/09/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 12/04/2013