Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/22/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/23/2013
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 06/05/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/28/2013
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 07/09/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 07/18/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 07/18/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 08/01/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 02/14/2014
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/21/2014