Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 05/15/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 05/15/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/17/2013
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 05/17/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 05/17/2013
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 05/17/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/21/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 05/21/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/03/2013
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/03/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 06/03/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 06/05/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 06/06/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/11/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/11/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 06/12/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/14/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 06/25/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/25/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/27/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/08/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 07/08/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/10/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/10/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/10/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/25/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 06/19/2014