Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 05/17/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 05/22/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 06/11/2013
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 07/23/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 07/30/2013