Refine your search

Refined by:

Florida Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 05/17/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 05/22/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 05/22/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 05/22/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 06/03/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 06/03/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 06/05/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/13/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 06/25/2013
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 07/09/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 07/09/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 07/10/2013