Refine your search

Refined by:

Georgia Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 05/20/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/03/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/05/2013
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 07/16/2013