Refine your search

Refined by:

Missouri Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 05/17/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 06/13/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 06/25/2013
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 07/08/2013