Text: H.R.2009 — 113th Congress (2013-2014)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Bill text available as:

Shown Here:
Placed on Calendar Senate (09/18/2013)

Calendar No. 192

113th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. R. 2009

To prohibit the Secretary of the Treasury from enforcing the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act and the Health Care and Education Reconciliation Act of 2010.


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES
September 9, 2013

Received

September 17, 2013

Read the first time

September 18, 2013

Read the second time and placed on the calendar


AN ACT

To prohibit the Secretary of the Treasury from enforcing the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act and the Health Care and Education Reconciliation Act of 2010.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Keep the IRS Off Your Health Care Act of 2013”.

SEC. 2. Findings.

Congress finds the following:

(1) On May 10, 2013, the Internal Revenue Service admitted that it singled out advocacy groups, based on ideology, seeking tax-exempt status.

(2) This action raises pertinent questions about the agency’s ability to implement and oversee Public Law 111–148 and Public Law 111–152.

(3) This action could be an indication of future Internal Revenue Service abuses in relation to Public Law 111–148 and Public Law 111–152 given that it is their responsibility to enforce a key provision, the individual mandate.

(4) Americans accept the principle that patients, families, and doctors should be making medical decisions, not the Federal Government.

SEC. 3. Prohibiting enforcement of PPACA and HCERA.

The Secretary of the Treasury, or any delegate of the Secretary, shall not implement or enforce any provisions of or amendments made by Public Law 111–148 or 111–152.

Passed the House of Representatives August 2, 2013.

Attest:
Karen L. Haas,

Clerk  


Calendar No. 192

113th CONGRESS
     1st Session
H. R. 2009

AN ACT
To prohibit the Secretary of the Treasury from enforcing the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act and the Health Care and Education Reconciliation Act of 2010.

September 18, 2013
Read the second time and placed on the calendar