Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 05/17/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 05/20/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 05/21/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 05/21/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 05/21/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 05/22/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/10/2013