Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 06/06/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/13/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 06/18/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 06/18/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 07/08/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 07/09/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 07/10/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 07/19/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/19/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/25/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 07/25/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 09/12/2013