Text: H.R.2011 — 113th Congress (2013-2014)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Referred in Senate (10/29/2013)


113th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. R. 2011

IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES
October 29, 2013

Received; read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs


AN ACT

To amend title 38, United States Code, to provide for a two-year extension of the Veterans’ Advisory Committee on Education.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Veterans' Advisory Committee on Education Improvement Act of 2013”.

SEC. 2. Two-year extension of Veterans’ Advisory Committee on Education.

Section 3692 of title 38, United States Code, is amended—

(1) in subsection (a)—

(A) by inserting “31,” after “30,”; and

(B) by striking “and the Persian Gulf War” and inserting “the Persian Gulf War, and the post-9/11 operations in Iraq and Afghanistan”; and

(2) in subsection (c), by striking “December 31, 2013” and inserting “December 31, 2015”.

Passed the House of Representatives October 28, 2013.

Attest: karen l. haas,   
Clerk