There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Military Justice Improvement Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 10, United States Code, to modify various authorities relating to procedures for courts-martial under the Uniform Code of Military Justice, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/16/2013 Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
06/20/2013 Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
05/16/2013 Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/16/2013 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (73)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 05/20/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/20/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 05/20/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/20/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 05/21/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/21/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 06/03/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 06/05/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 06/05/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 06/06/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/06/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/11/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 06/12/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 06/13/2013
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/14/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/17/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/18/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/18/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 06/19/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/19/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5] 06/19/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 06/19/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/24/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 06/26/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/27/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 06/27/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/28/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 06/28/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/08/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/08/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 07/08/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 07/08/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/10/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 07/16/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/16/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 07/17/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/17/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 07/17/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 07/17/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 07/18/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 07/18/2013
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 07/18/2013
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/19/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 07/30/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/30/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 08/01/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 08/01/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 08/01/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 08/01/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 08/01/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 08/01/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 08/01/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 08/01/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 08/01/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 08/01/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 08/01/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 08/01/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 08/02/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 08/02/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/28/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 10/09/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 10/09/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 10/09/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 11/20/2013
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 11/22/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 12/02/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 03/05/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/14/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 12/04/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services05/16/2013 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel06/20/2013 Referred to

Related Bills (4)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (12)

  • Assault and harassment offenses
  • Congressional oversight
  • Crime victims
  • Crimes against women
  • Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
  • Criminal procedure and sentencing
  • Government studies and investigations
  • Military command and structure
  • Military law
  • Military personnel and dependents
  • Sex offenses

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2016. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/16/2013)

Military Justice Improvement Act of 2013 - Amends the Uniform Code of Military Justice (UCMJ), with respect to charges that allege an offense triable by court-martial (with certain exclusions) for which the maximum punishment includes confinement for more than one year, to direct the Secretary of Defense (DOD) to require the Secretaries of the military departments to provide for the determination of whether to try such charges by general or special court-martial to be made by a commissioned officer of grade O-6 or higher with significant experience in such trials and who is outside the chain of command of the accused. Provides that a determination not to proceed to trial shall not preclude a commanding officer from either referring such charges for trial by summary court-martial or imposing non-judicial punishment.

Requires Rule 306 (relating to policy on initial disposition of offenses) of the Manual for Courts-Martial to be amended to strike the character and military service of the accused from factors to be considered by the disposition authority.

Revises the list of officers authorized to convene general and special courts-martial to include those in grade O-6 or higher assigned such responsibility by their department chief of staff (with the same prohibition against an officer in the same chain of command as the accused). Requires each chief of staff to establish an office which shall convene general and special courts-martial and detail judges and members.

Requires a military judge to call a general or special court-martial trial into session within 90 days of the determination of its necessity.

Requires a convening authority (the official acting on the sentence of a court-martial), when taking any action other than approving a sentence, to prepare a written justification of such action which shall be made part of the record of the court-martial. Prohibits a convening authority from: (1) dismissing or setting aside a finding of guilty, or (2) reducing a finding of guilty to a finding of guilty to a lesser included offense.

Requires a commanding officer who receives a report of a sexual-related offense involving a member in such officer's chain of command to act immediately upon such report by way of referral to the appropriate criminal investigative office or service.

Amends the National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2013 to require an independent panel established by the DOD Secretary to monitor and assess the implementation and efficacy of this Act and its amendments.