Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 05/20/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/20/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 06/26/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 06/27/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 08/01/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 08/02/2013