Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 05/20/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/20/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 05/20/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/20/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 05/21/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/21/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 06/03/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 06/06/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/11/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 06/13/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5] 06/19/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 06/19/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/24/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 06/26/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/27/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 06/27/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/28/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/08/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/08/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 07/08/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 07/08/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/10/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 07/16/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/16/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/30/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 08/01/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 08/01/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 08/01/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 08/01/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 08/01/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 08/01/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 08/01/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 08/01/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 08/02/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/28/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 12/02/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 03/05/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/14/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 12/04/2014