Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 07/22/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 08/01/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 09/20/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 10/30/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 12/02/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 12/03/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 11/18/2014