Refine your search

Showing 6 of 6 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
04/03/2014 Became Public Law No: 113-94.
04/03/2014 Signed by President.
03/25/2014 Presented to President.
03/11/2014 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S1492)
12/11/2013 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 295 - 103 (Roll no. 632).(text: CR H7653-7654)
05/16/2013 Introduced in House