Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 06/03/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 06/05/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 06/14/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 06/19/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 07/11/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 07/11/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 07/22/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 07/24/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-23] 09/18/2013

Show cosponsors who withdrew