Refine your search

Refined by:

Florida Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/23/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 06/03/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 06/05/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 06/06/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 06/06/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 06/14/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 06/18/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 07/17/2013
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/24/2013

Show cosponsors who withdrew