Refine your search

Refined by:

Michigan Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 05/23/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 06/05/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 06/12/2013
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/18/2013
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/19/2013

Show cosponsors who withdrew