Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 06/03/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 06/05/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 06/05/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 06/06/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 06/18/2013

Show cosponsors who withdrew