Refine your search

Refined by:

Tennessee Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/22/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 06/03/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/05/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/06/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 06/06/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 07/11/2013

Show cosponsors who withdrew