Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 05/20/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 05/20/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/20/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 05/20/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 05/20/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/20/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/20/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 05/20/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 05/20/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 05/20/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/20/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/20/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/20/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/20/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/20/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/20/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/20/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/20/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 05/20/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 05/21/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 05/21/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 05/21/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 05/21/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/21/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/21/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 05/22/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 05/22/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/22/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 05/22/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/22/2013
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 05/22/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 05/22/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 05/23/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 05/23/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 05/23/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/23/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 06/04/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/04/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/04/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 06/04/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 06/04/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/04/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 06/12/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 06/12/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 06/12/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 06/12/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 06/13/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/18/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 06/18/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 06/28/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 07/08/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 09/10/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 10/08/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 03/11/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 05/19/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/20/2014
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 07/11/2014