Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/11/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 06/11/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 06/11/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 06/11/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 03/06/2014
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 03/06/2014
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/29/2014
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 07/03/2014