Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/20/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 05/20/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 05/20/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/22/2013
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 05/22/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 05/22/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/22/2013
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 05/22/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 05/22/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 05/22/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 05/22/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 05/22/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 05/22/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 05/23/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/23/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/23/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 06/03/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 06/03/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 06/03/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 06/06/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 06/06/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 06/10/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/11/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/11/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 06/11/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/12/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 06/13/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 06/17/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 06/19/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 06/19/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 07/09/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 07/11/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/11/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 07/23/2013
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 08/01/2013
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 09/25/2013