Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 05/22/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 06/03/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/12/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 06/20/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/25/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/11/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 08/02/2013