Refine your search

Refined by:

Florida Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 07/09/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 02/14/2014
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 03/04/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 03/14/2014