Refine your search

Refined by:

Massachusetts Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 05/16/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/06/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5] 06/13/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 11/19/2013
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 03/04/2014
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 07/25/2014