Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/22/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 06/06/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 06/13/2013
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 06/13/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 10/28/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 02/04/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 02/14/2014
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 06/12/2014
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 07/16/2014
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/29/2014
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 07/31/2014