There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Community College Energy Training Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Secretary of Energy, in coordination with the Secretary of Labor, to establish a program to provide for workforce training and education, at community colleges, in sustainable energy.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/16/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
07/08/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
05/16/2013Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/16/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/26/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 06/26/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/17/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/07/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 10/22/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 01/28/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce05/16/2013 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training07/08/2013 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2029.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2029. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/16/2013)

Community College Energy Training Act of 2013 - Directs the Secretary of Energy (DOE), in coordination with the Secretary of Labor, to create a program awarding grants to community colleges to provide workforce training and education in sustainable energy industries and practices, such as: (1) alternative energy; (2) high-performance green building construction, design, and redevelopment; (3) sustainable energy technologies; (4) water, energy, and resource conservation; (5) recycling and waste reduction; and (6) sustainable agriculture and farming.

Requires at least one-half of the grant funds to be awarded to community colleges with existing sustainability programs leading to certificates, credentials, or degrees in one or more of these industries or practices.