Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/26/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 06/26/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/17/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/07/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 10/22/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 01/28/2014