Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 05/23/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 05/23/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/06/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/06/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/27/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 07/23/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 07/23/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 09/09/2014