Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/17/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 05/17/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 05/17/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 05/20/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/20/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 05/21/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 05/22/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/03/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/25/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 05/29/2014