Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 05/17/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12]* 05/17/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 05/17/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/17/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1]* 05/17/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 05/17/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 05/17/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 05/17/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 05/22/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 05/23/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/04/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 06/25/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 09/09/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 10/28/2013