Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 05/17/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 05/17/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/17/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/17/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/17/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 05/20/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 07/09/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 07/15/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 07/17/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/17/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/23/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 07/30/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 07/31/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 08/02/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 08/02/2013